×

×

## Mathematics / Arithmetic Operations on Numbers

### Mathematics / Arithmetic Operations on Numbers

Arithmetic operations are an integral part of our everyday life. We need to know Addition, Subtraction, Multiplication and Division well.  We use these operations during money transactions while shopping, while dividing chocolates and cakes among friends or while organising a school trip, and many more occasions.

Can you think of more scenarios where we use arithmetic operations in our everyday life?  Exercises
Lessons
Topics
Exercises
Lessons
Topics
• ### Multiplication - SmartTest

SmartTest on Multiplication

• Accessed by: 232 Students
• Average Time: 00:30:05
• Average Score: 49.86
• Questions: 100 ### Division - SmartTest

SmartTest on Division

• Accessed by: 176 Students
• Average Time: 00:32:00
• Average Score: 48.38
• Questions: 298 • Accessed by: 310 Students
• Average Time: 00:15:53
• Average Score: 65.95
• Questions: 101 ### Subtraction - SmartTest

SmartTest on Subtraction

• Accessed by: 143 Students
• Average Time: 00:27:51
• Average Score: 65.51
• Questions: 100
• Introduction to Mathematical Operations
• Subtraction
• Multiplication
• Division
• Mixed problems
• ### Subtraction

Lesson on Subtraction

• Accessed by: 100 Students ### Multiplication

Practice Multiplication

• Accessed by: 208 Students Addition - Pop the right balloons

• Accessed by: 187 Students ### Subtraction

Learnhive lesson on Subtraction ### Division - Equal Distribution

A learnhive lesson on Introduciton to division. Explains division as equal distribution

• Accessed by: 248 Students ### Long Division

Practice long division and become a pro in division. Learn division words like divisor, dividend, quotient and remainder.

• Accessed by: 260 Students

### Factoids

Fun with multiplication by 11:
Let us learn an easy way of multiplying numbers by 11:

For 2 digit numbers : Add the two digits and place them in-between the two digits.
Example 1: 27 * 11 = 297
Example 2: 84 * 11 = 924 – For sums greater than 9, carry over the 1 to the previous digit.

For 3 digit number:  Add the first 2 digits and the last two digits and place the sums in between the first and the last digits in the same order.
Example 1: 163 * 11 = 1793
Example 2: 338 * 11= 3718 - For sums greater than 9, carry over the 1 to the previous digit.
Example 3: 274 * 11 = 3014 - For sums greater than 9, carry over the 1 to the previous digit.
Example 4: 584 * 11 = 6424 - For sums greater than 9, carry over the 1 to the previous digit.