×

Learnhive Sign Up


By clicking on the above button you confirm that you are at least 13 years old and agree to our Terms of Service & Privacy Policy.
Already have a Learnhive account?
×

Mathematics / Arithmetic Operations on Numbers

Mathematics / Arithmetic Operations on Numbers

"

Arithmetic operations are an integral part of our everyday life. We need to know Addition, Subtraction, Multiplication and Division well.  We use these operations during money transactions while shopping, while dividing chocolates and cakes among friends or while organising a school trip, and many more occasions.

Can you think of more scenarios where we use arithmetic operations in our everyday life?  

"
Exercises
Lessons
Topics
Exercises
Lessons
Topics
  • Multiplication - SmartTest

    SmartTest on Multiplication

    • Accessed by: 117 Students
    • Average Time: 00:26:54
    • Average Score: 50.22
    • Questions: 100

    Division - SmartTest

    SmartTest on Arithmetic Operations on Numbers

    • Questions: 149

    Mixed Problems - SmartTest

    SmartTest on Arithmetic Operations on Numbers

    • Questions: 50
    • Addition
    • Subtraction
    • Multiplication
    • Division
    • Mixed Problems
  • Division - Equal Distribution

    A learnhive lesson on Introduciton to division. Explains division as equal distribution

    • Accessed by: 240 Students

    Long Division

    Practice long division and become a pro in division. Learn division words like divisor, dividend, quotient and remainder.

    • Accessed by: 221 Students

Factoids

"

Fun with multiplication by 11:
Let us learn an easy way of multiplying numbers by 11:

For 2 digit numbers : Add the two digits and place them in-between the two digits.
Example 1: 27 * 11 = 297
Example 2: 84 * 11 = 924 – For sums greater than 9, carry over the 1 to the previous digit.
 

For 3 digit number:  Add the first 2 digits and the last two digits and place the sums in between the first and the last digits in the same order.
Example 1: 163 * 11 = 1793
Example 2: 338 * 11= 3718 - For sums greater than 9, carry over the 1 to the previous digit.
Example 3: 274 * 11 = 3014 - For sums greater than 9, carry over the 1 to the previous digit.
Example 4: 584 * 11 = 6424 - For sums greater than 9, carry over the 1 to the previous digit.

"

×

×

×

Learnhive Login

Some message