×

Learnhive Sign Up


By clicking on the above button you confirm that you are at least 13 years old and agree to our Terms of Service & Privacy Policy.
Already have a Learnhive account?
×

Mathematics / Operations on Numbers

Mathematics / Operations on Numbers

Arithmetic operations are an integral part of our everyday life. We need to know Addition, Subtraction, Multiplication and Division well.  We use these operations during money transactions while shopping, while dividing chocolates and cakes among friends or while organising a school trip, and many more occasions.

Can you think of more scenarios where we use arithmetic operations in our everyday life?  

Addition and SubtractionMultiplication and Division

Lessons
Topics
Lessons
Topics
    • Introduction to Operations on Number
    • Addition and Subtraction
    • Adding and Subtracting With Money
    • Multiplication and Division
    • Review of Operations on Number
  • Addition and Subtraction

    A lesson on Addition and Subtraction

    Multiplication and Division

    Lesson on Multiplication and division

    Properties of Operations

    Lesson on Properties of Operations

    Arithmetic Operations on Numbers -- Summary

    Learnhive Lesson on Arithmetic Operations on Numbers

    • Accessed by: 254 Students

    Numeric Expressions : BODMAS -- Summary

    Learnhive Lesson on Numeric Expressions : BODMAS

    • Accessed by: 415 Students

Factoids

Fun with multiplication by 11:
Let us learn an easy way of multiplying numbers by 11:

For 2 digit numbers : Add the two digits and place them in-between the two digits.
Example 1: 27 * 11 = 297
Example 2: 84 * 11 = 924 – For sums greater than 9, carry over the 1 to the previous digit.
 

For 3 digit number:  Add the first 2 digits and the last two digits and place the sums in between the first and the last digits in the same order.
Example 1: 163 * 11 = 1793
Example 2: 338 * 11= 3718 - For sums greater than 9, carry over the 1 to the previous digit.
Example 3: 274 * 11 = 3014 - For sums greater than 9, carry over the 1 to the previous digit.
Example 4: 584 * 11 = 6424 - For sums greater than 9, carry over the 1 to the previous digit.

×

×

×

Learnhive Login

Some message